NY S00547 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reimbursement for studies for districts subject to reorganization when appropriated.
Title
Relates to reimbursement for studies for districts subject to reorganization when appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1165 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02370 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education