NY S00565 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lengthens the suspension of a driver's license for any person found to have illegally purchased or to have attempted to illegally purchase an alcoholic beverage.
Title
Lengthens the suspension of a driver's license for any person found to have illegally purchased or to have attempted to illegally purchase an alcoholic beverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.88 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 565A |
2011-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |