NY S00614 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the authorization and regulation of visitation of compassionate care-giving visitors at nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Title
Provides for the authorization and regulation of visitation of compassionate care-giving visitors at nursing homes and residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.3 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.89 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.85 |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | substituted for a1052b |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.348 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | AMENDED 614B |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.348 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 614A |
2021-01-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01052 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - substituted by s614b
A04312 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - enacting clause stricken
A04312 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - enacting clause stricken