NY S00643 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.
Title
Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-01-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.661 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06210 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken