NY S00763 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 763A
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 763A
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount recipients of enhanced residential care may maintain in a personal allowance account and payments to the aged, blind and disabled.
Title
Increases the amount recipients of enhanced residential care may maintain in a personal allowance account and payments to the aged, blind and disabled.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 763A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A03120 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - enacting clause stricken