NY S01207 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5309A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5309A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the appointment of a health care agent or surrogate who is the subject of an order of protection protecting the principal.
Title
Prohibits the appointment of a health care agent or surrogate who is the subject of an order of protection protecting the principal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5309A |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.201 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1207A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05309 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.93