NY S01375 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces number of signatures required for a nominating petition for congressional district election; reduces signatures to 2000 from 3500.
Title
Reduces number of signatures required for a nominating petition for congressional district election; reduces signatures to 2000 from 3500.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Hiram Monserrate [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | |
2010-05-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-26 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-25 | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 | |
2010-05-18 | PRINT NUMBER 1375B | |
2010-05-18 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-05-06 | PRINT NUMBER 1375A | |
2010-05-06 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-01-29 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A2651-A (Same As) 2010-05-24 - print number 2651c