NY S01845 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employers with a tax credit in an amount not to exceed 20% of expenses incurred in providing day care services to the children and wards of its employees and in training persons employed by the taxpayer or a third party provider rendering such services; provides that to receive such credit the facility or program rendering day care services must be licensed.
Title
Provides employers with a tax credit in an amount not to exceed 20% of expenses incurred in providing day care services to the children and wards of its employees and in training persons employed by the taxpayer or a third party provider rendering such services; provides that to receive such credit the facility or program rendering day care services must be licensed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1845A |
2012-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06246 (Same As) 2012-01-11 - print number 6246a