NY S01873 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maximum number of employees that a minority and women-owned business enterprise may have during a declared state disaster emergency or other emergency or critical need; changes such maximum from three hundred employees to three hundred employees who work thirty or more hours per week over the period of fifty-two weeks for a total of 1,560 hours worked.
Title
Relates to the maximum number of employees that a minority and women-owned business enterprise may have during a declared state disaster emergency or other emergency or critical need; changes such maximum from three hundred employees to three hundred employees who work thirty or more hours per week over the period of fifty-two weeks for a total of 1,560 hours worked.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.46 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.700 |
2023-11-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a7295a |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1873A |
2023-05-22 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A07295 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - substituted by s1873a