NY S02318 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from knowingly engaging in a repeated course of cyberbullying of a minor; guilty of an unclassified misdemeanor punishable by a fine not more than one thousand dollars, or by a period of imprisonment not to exceed one year, or both.
Title
Prohibits a person from knowingly engaging in a repeated course of cyberbullying of a minor; guilty of an unclassified misdemeanor punishable by a fine not more than one thousand dollars, or by a period of imprisonment not to exceed one year, or both.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.108 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1169 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2318A |
2017-05-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08088 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - referred to education
A09741 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to education
A09741 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to education