NY S02380 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides three options for the designation of sex by applicants for non-driver identification cards, drivers' licenses and learners' permits.
Title
Provides three options for the designation of sex by applicants for non-driver identification cards, drivers' licenses and learners' permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2380B |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2380A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05395 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means