NY S02698 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the production of proof of insurance by the use of electronic transmission to portable electronic devices.
Title
Authorizes the production of proof of insurance by the use of electronic transmission to portable electronic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.717 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05547 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation