NY S03068 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3068A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3068A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the training of boards of directors or trustees of certain voluntary not-for-profit facilities or corporations.
Title
Relates to the training of boards of directors or trustees of certain voluntary not-for-profit facilities or corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3068A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |