NY S03151 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring the commissioner of the department of civil service to prepare a report on mental health practitioner classification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring the commissioner of the department of civil service to prepare a report on mental health practitioner classification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.229
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback