NY S03221 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to establish an internet website for comparison of federal home equity conversion reverse mortgage products offered in the state.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to establish an internet website for comparison of federal home equity conversion reverse mortgage products offered in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.173 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1380 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3221 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.134 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to rules 5625a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-14 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5625A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1380 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05625 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled