NY S03232 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence with sufficient time to cast such ballot prior to the close of polls.
Title
Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence with sufficient time to cast such ballot prior to the close of polls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | signed chap.150 |
2019-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.615 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3232A |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-13 | Senate | amended on third reading 219a |
2019-02-28 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.67 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A219A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.615 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3232A |
2019-04-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00219 (Same As) 2019-08-08 - signed chap.150