NY S03701 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.
Title
Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3701B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3701A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A03726 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means