NY S03872 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the geriatric demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration; authorizes the commissioner of mental health and the commissioner of health to waive rules and regulations to address barriers to collaboration by mental health providers and providers of home care services; provides further that regulations pertaining to patient safety may not be waived, nor shall regulations be waived if such waiver would risk patient safety.
Title
Relates to the geriatric demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration; authorizes the commissioner of mental health and the commissioner of health to waive rules and regulations to address barriers to collaboration by mental health providers and providers of home care services; provides further that regulations pertaining to patient safety may not be waived, nor shall regulations be waived if such waiver would risk patient safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.180 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3872A |
2019-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.298 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06566 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.233