NY S04317 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to service animals, guide dogs, hearing dogs and service dogs.
Title
Relates to service animals, guide dogs, hearing dogs and service dogs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5788 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.315 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05788 (Same As) 2014-12-29 - approval memo.29