NY S04471 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.
Title
Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4471A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.761 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07915 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.149