NY S05199 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the board of elections to provide special ballots to board of election employees anytime up to the close of polls on election day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.713
2019-04-16SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00202 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback