NY S05248 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disposal of any dredged spoils containing toxic pollutants into the waters of the marine district.
Title
Prohibits the disposal of any dredged spoils containing toxic pollutants into the waters of the marine district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1491 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04734 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation