NY S05288 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition of boards of elections.
Title
Relates to the composition of boards of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | referred to election law | |
2010-05-04 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-04 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-04-16 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-25 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-24 | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 | |
2010-03-22 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | |
2010-03-18 | PRINT NUMBER 5288A | |
2010-03-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-02-02 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-01-12 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-12 | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-04 | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A657 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - opinion referred to judiciary