NY S05288 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires websites providing sex offender registry information to be searchable by the zip code of a registrant's employment.
Title
Requires websites providing sex offender registry information to be searchable by the zip code of a registrant's employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1236 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5288A |
2012-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1248 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10740 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - referred to correction