NY S05288 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5288D
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5288D
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Title
Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5288D |
2014-03-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5288C |
2013-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5288B |
2013-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5288A |
2013-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04841 (Same As) 2014-03-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH