NY S05674 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to retaliatory personnel actions by employers.
Title
Relates to retaliatory personnel actions by employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-11-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5674A |
2011-11-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2011-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08348 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to labor