NY S05726 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; penalty not to exceed $125.
Title
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; penalty not to exceed $125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a1307a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1164 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01307 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH