NY S06119 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines a hotel license.
Title
Defines a hotel license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8174 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.151 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08174 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.230