NY S06172 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to clarifying that reasonable accommodation to enable a person with a disability to use and enjoy a dwelling includes the use of an animal to alleviate the symptoms or effects of a disability.
Title
Relates to clarifying that reasonable accommodation to enable a person with a disability to use and enjoy a dwelling includes the use of an animal to alleviate the symptoms or effects of a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.137 |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.410 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6172 |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.266 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.436 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-23 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7331 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.410 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.976 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07331 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137