NY S06209 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6209A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6209A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state seniors trust fund and directing certain moneys to be deposited into such fund.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state seniors trust fund and directing certain moneys to be deposited into such fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | PRINT NUMBER 6209A | |
2010-03-12 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-26 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-10-09 | REFERRED TO RULES |