NY S06259 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for advance payment of the earned income credit by employers, the commissioner of the department of tax and finance and the commissioner of New York City's department of finance.
Title
Provides for advance payment of the earned income credit by employers, the commissioner of the department of tax and finance and the commissioner of New York City's department of finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.554 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6259C |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6259B |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1440 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6259A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08066 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - print number 8066b