NY S06307 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology and establishes such education programs.
Title
Requires domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for persons engaged in the practice of nail specialty, waxing, natural hair styling, esthetics and cosmetology and establishes such education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.62 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.715 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1444 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6307 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.465 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A57 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1444 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00057 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.62