NY S06407 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6407C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6407C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to qualifying offenses for pre-trial detention.
Title
Relates to qualifying offenses for pre-trial detention.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6407C |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-11-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6407B |
2019-11-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6407A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08502 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - print number 8502a