NY S06489 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of concealment of a death when a person knowingly moves or otherwise conceals a human corpse so that discovery of the death of such person will be hindered; makes such crime a class D felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of concealment of a death when a person knowingly moves or otherwise conceals a human corpse so that discovery of the death of such person will be hindered; makes such crime a class D felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.496 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09358 (Same As) 2012-02-22 - referred to codes