NY S06648 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires instruction regarding symbols of hate, including the swastika and the noose, to be incorporated into the curricula for grades six through twelve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires instruction regarding symbols of hate, including the swastika and the noose, to be incorporated into the curricula for grades six through twelve.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.153
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2019-08-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08545 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback