NY S06664 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1942 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6664A |
2018-05-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2082 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08718 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - print number 8718a