NY S06735 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of general services to conduct a study relating to the feasibility and advisability of establishing an office of risk assessment and management, and/or expanding the duties of the chief risk officer.
Title
Directs the office of general services to conduct a study relating to the feasibility and advisability of establishing an office of risk assessment and management, and/or expanding the duties of the chief risk officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.614 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1982 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07588 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - reported referred to rules