NY S06947 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic herring.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic herring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.340 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.558 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a7474 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1155 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07474 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6947