NY S07072 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of permitting them to receive land at no cost from Suffolk County to be placed under their stewardship.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of permitting them to receive land at no cost from Suffolk County to be placed under their stewardship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7354 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1128 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07354 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - signed chap.160