NY S07432 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to develop a patient wellness bill of rights to inform patients of those services provided under wellness care and when such services become diagnostic and treatment services.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to develop a patient wellness bill of rights to inform patients of those services provided under wellness care and when such services become diagnostic and treatment services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.786 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |