NY S07538 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Jamestown by allowing such inspectors to be residents of Chautauqua county.
Title
Provides a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Jamestown by allowing such inspectors to be residents of Chautauqua county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.173 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.708 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7538 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.284 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.691 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | rules report cal.691 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to cities |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7648 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.708 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07648 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173