NY S07674 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to increase the number of regional farmers' markets for the direct marketing of foods and produce produced in the state.
Title
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to increase the number of regional farmers' markets for the direct marketing of foods and produce produced in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.497 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09835 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - referred to agriculture