NY S07827 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting state route one hundred four in the town of Lewiston, county of Niagara as the "General William 'Wild Bill' Donovan Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting state route one hundred four in the town of Lewiston, county of Niagara as the "General William 'Wild Bill' Donovan Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.276 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10548 |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.768 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10548 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7827