NY S07835 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed and the agency had no such reasonable basis for denying access, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time, or when the record is substantially disclosed and the agency lacked a reasonable basis in law for withholding the record.
Title
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed and the agency had no such reasonable basis for denying access, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time, or when the record is substantially disclosed and the agency lacked a reasonable basis in law for withholding the record.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.539 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |