NY S07912 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies and entities to ensure their websites are accessible to persons with disabilities by following certain protocol; requires the office of information technology services to provide a report to the governor and legislature every two years.
Title
Requires state agencies and entities to ensure their websites are accessible to persons with disabilities by following certain protocol; requires the office of information technology services to provide a report to the governor and legislature every two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.811 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A10086 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - referred to governmental operations