NY S07935 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town justice court of the town of Canandaigua to hold justice court in the city of Canandaigua.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town justice court of the town of Canandaigua to hold justice court in the city of Canandaigua.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.441
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.1033
2018-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a10095a
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-07SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7935A
2018-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.813
2018-03-12SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A10095 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7935a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback