NY S08325 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for contracts for the provision of special education and related services for certain patients hospitalized in hospitals operated by the office of mental health.
Title
Extends authorization for contracts for the provision of special education and related services for certain patients hospitalized in hospitals operated by the office of mental health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10471 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1462 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10471 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - signed chap.89