NY S08445 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 8445B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 8445B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a temporary ban on the commencement of mortgage foreclosure actions and the sale of foreclosed properties for 365 days after the last region or county enters into phase 3 of the governor's reopening plan relating to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Imposes a temporary ban on the commencement of mortgage foreclosure actions and the sale of foreclosed properties for 365 days after the last region or county enters into phase 3 of the governor's reopening plan relating to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8445B |
2020-06-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8445A |
2020-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10553 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - print number 10553b