NY S08736 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9819A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9819A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Syracuse regional airport authority to designate its appointed security officers as peace officers or police officers pursuant to the criminal procedure law.
Title
Authorizes the Syracuse regional airport authority to designate its appointed security officers as peace officers or police officers pursuant to the criminal procedure law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9819A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1675 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8736A |
2022-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09819 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - signed chap.425