OH HB1 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 62-6)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 62-6)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 6301.01, 6301.02, 6301.03, 6301.04, 6301.06, 6301.07, 6301.08, 6301.09, 6301.10, and 6301.12 and to enact section 6301.061 of the Revised Code to require a local workforce investment area to use OhioMeansJobs as the local workforce investment area's job placement system, to rename county one-stop systems, and to make other changes to Ohio's Workforce Development Law.
Title
To require a local workforce investment area to use OhioMeansJobs as the local workforce investment area's job placement system, to rename county one-stop systems, and to make other changes to Ohio's Workforce Development Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Effective Date | |
2013-06-27 | Governor' Action | |
2013-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-06-18 | Concurrence | |
2013-06-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-06-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-03-20 | To Workforce & Economic Development | |
2013-03-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-06 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-01-30 | To Manufacturing and Workforce Development | |
2013-01-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
63 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
63 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | 01 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |